I want to know about...
- Spain
Social denomination | STAGI INTERNACIONAL SA |
---|---|
Alternative Name | Stagi Internacional Sociedad Anonima |
Registration | Registro Mercantil de Madrid |
Officer | Post | Appointment | Termination or Resignation |
---|---|---|---|
CASTAÑON RODRIGUEZ LUIS | Administrador Solidario | 26/10/2009 | 02/09/2015 |
CASTAÑON SANCHEZ LUIS MARIA | Administrador Solidario | 13/07/2021 | 02/09/2015 |
SANCHEZ LARRAGA MARIA DEL CARMEN MONTSERRAT | Apoderado | 27/10/2009 | |
CASTAÑON RODRIGUEZ LUIS | Consejero | 26/10/2009 | |
CASTAÑON SANCHEZ LUIS MARIA | Consejero | 26/10/2009 | |
CASTAÑON SANCHEZ MARIA VERONICA | Consejero | 26/10/2009 | |
SANCHEZ LARRAGA MARIA DEL CARMEN MONTSERRAT | Consejero | 26/10/2009 | |
CASTAÑON RODRIGUEZ LUIS | Presidente | 26/10/2009 | |
CASTAÑON SANCHEZ LUIS MARIA | Secretario | 26/10/2009 | |
CASTAÑON RODRIGUEZ LUIS | Consejero Delegado Solidario | 26/10/2009 | |
CASTAÑON SANCHEZ LUIS MARIA | Consejero Delegado Solidario | 26/10/2009 | |
CASTAÑON SANCHEZ LUIS MARIA | Administrador Unico | 02/09/2015 | 13/07/2021 |
CASTAÑON SANCHEZ MARIA-VERONICA | Apoderado | 02/09/2015 | |
CASTAÑON SANCHEZ MARIA-VERONICA | Administrador Solidario | 13/07/2021 |
06/11/2009 - STAGI INTERNACIONAL SA
06/11/2009 - STAGI INTERNACIONAL SA
01/03/2013 - STAGI INTERNACIONAL SA
15/09/2015 - STAGI INTERNACIONAL SA
15/09/2015 - STAGI INTERNACIONAL SA